Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/14/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 09/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/12/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/26/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/28/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/01/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/01/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/01/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 11/15/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/19/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/07/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/10/2014