Committees: H.R.1797 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/26/2013 Referred to
06/12/2013 Markup by
06/14/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-109
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/23/2013 Referred to
06/03/2013 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice05/23/2013 Referred to
05/23/2013 Hearings by
06/04/2013 Markup by
06/04/2013 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform04/26/2013 Referred to
06/14/2013 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary06/19/2013 Referred to