Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/26/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/10/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/10/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/11/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/11/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 06/13/2013