Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/24/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/11/2013