Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/30/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 06/14/2013