Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/05/2013