There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Blue Alert Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Blue Alert Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

National Blue Alert Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage, enhance, and integrate Blue Alert plans throughout the United States in order to disseminate information when a law enforcement officer is seriously injured or killed in the line of duty.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/14/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 2 (Roll no. 144).(text: CR H2579-2580)
05/14/2013Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-54.
01/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2013SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 284.
05/15/2013SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/14/2013-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/14/2013-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 2 (Roll no. 144). (text: CR H2579-2580)
05/14/2013-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2586-2587)
05/14/2013-5:16pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/14/2013-5:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 180.
05/14/2013-5:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2579-2582)
05/14/2013-5:03pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/14/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
05/14/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-54.
05/07/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/07/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/06/2013HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged.
01/25/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/04/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/04/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/04/2013 Referred to
05/07/2013 Markup by
05/14/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-54
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/25/2013 Referred to
05/06/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/14/2013)

National Blue Alert Act of 2013 - Directs the Attorney General to: (1) establish a national Blue Alert communications network within the Department of Justice (DOJ) to disseminate information when a law enforcement officer is seriously injured or killed in the line of duty, in coordination with federal, state, and local Blue Alert plans; and (2) assign an existing DOJ officer to act as the national coordinator of the Blue Alert communications network.

Sets forth the duties of the national coordinator, including: (1) providing assistance to states and local governments that are using Blue Alert plans; (2) establishing voluntary guidelines for states and local governments to use in developing such plans; (3) developing protocols for efforts to apprehend suspects; (4) working with states to ensure appropriate regional coordination of various elements of the network; (5) establishing an advisory group to assist states, local governments, law enforcement agencies, and other entities in initiating, facilitating, and promoting Blue Alert plans; (6) acting as the nationwide point of contact for the development of the network and the regional coordination of Blue Alerts through the network; and (7) determining what procedures and practices are in use for notifying law enforcement and the public when a law enforcement officer is killed or seriously injured in the line of duty and which of the procedures and practices are effective and do not require the expenditure of additional resources to implement.

Requires the guidelines to: (1) provide that appropriate information relating to a Blue Alert is disseminated to officials of law enforcement, public health, and other agencies; and (2) provide mechanisms that ensure that Blue Alerts comply with all applicable federal, state, and local privacy laws and regulations and include standards that specifically provide for the protection of the civil liberties of law enforcement officers and their families.

Prohibits the coordinator from: (1) performing any official travel for the sole purpose of carrying out the duties of the coordinator, (2) lobbying any officer of a state regarding the funding or implementation of a Blue Alert plan, or (3) hosting a conference focused solely on the Blue Alert program that requires the expenditure of federal funds.

Directs the coordinator to annually submit a report on the coordinator's activities and the effectiveness and status of the Blue Alert plans that are in effect or being developed.