Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/04/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/27/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/06/2013