Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/12/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/10/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/29/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/09/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/18/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/25/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/30/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/09/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/30/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/30/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/09/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/14/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/14/2014