Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/25/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/09/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/17/2014