Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/30/2014