Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/18/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/09/2014