Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/15/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/29/2013