Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/17/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/20/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/04/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/14/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/12/2013