Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/28/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/26/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/22/2014