There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Partner with Korea Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide high-skilled visas for nationals of the Republic of Korea, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/26/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/14/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/26/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (111)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/24/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/16/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/28/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/04/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 03/05/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/25/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/01/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/10/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/01/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/19/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/19/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/08/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/11/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/14/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/23/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/28/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/30/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/12/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/12/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 11/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/20/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/26/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security06/14/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1812. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2013)

Partner with Korea Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to create an E-4 treaty trader visa category for up to 15,000 nationals of the Republic of Korea (South Korea) each fiscal year who are coming to the United States solely to perform specialty occupation services and with respect to whom the Secretary of Labor has certified to the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) and the Secretary of State that the intending employer has filed an attestation concerning U.S. worker protections with the Secretary of Labor.