Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/24/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/30/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 09/10/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/12/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/16/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/30/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/05/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/28/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/04/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 03/05/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/25/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/27/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/01/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/04/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/09/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/10/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/01/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 06/19/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/19/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/19/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/08/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/11/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/14/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/23/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/28/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/30/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 08/01/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/12/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/12/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 11/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/20/2014