Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
07/25/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-140. (TXT | PDF)
07/25/2014 Signed by President.
07/15/2014 Presented to President.
07/10/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR H4436)
07/09/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
03/24/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 0 (Roll no. 137).(text: CR H2573)
04/26/2013 Introduced in House