Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/06/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/19/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/04/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/11/2014