Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/25/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014