Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/11/2014