Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/27/2014