Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/24/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/08/2014