Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/14/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/04/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/04/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/25/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/25/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/23/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 08/01/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/10/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/19/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/24/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/29/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/13/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/31/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/06/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2014