Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 04/26/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/07/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/08/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/09/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/15/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/13/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 06/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/13/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/28/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/19/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/25/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/06/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/27/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/27/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/24/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/29/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/11/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 01/08/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/21/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/10/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/10/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/11/2014