Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/22/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 07/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/23/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/21/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/08/2014