Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/04/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/05/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 02/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/05/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/16/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/23/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/14/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/05/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/17/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/20/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/23/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/14/2014