Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/07/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/09/2014