Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/28/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/24/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/24/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/31/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/13/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/27/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/02/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/04/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/20/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/16/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/10/2014