Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/30/2014