There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Dog Training Therapy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program on dog training therapy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/27/2014Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
01/22/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/04/2013Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/17/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/04/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health01/22/2013 Referred to
03/27/2014 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.183.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.183. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/04/2013)

Veterans Dog Training Therapy Act - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program for assessing the effectiveness of addressing post-deployment mental health and post-traumatic stress disorder symptoms through a therapeutic medium of service dog training and handling for veterans with disabilities. Requires such program to be carried out at Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical centers that can provide training areas for such purposes.