Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 08/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/17/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 11/12/2014