Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/09/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/27/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/28/2014