There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Cadet Nurse Corps Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that service of the members of the organization known as the United States Cadet Nurse Corps during World War II constituted active military service for purposes of laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
06/20/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/06/2013Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/06/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/06/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health05/08/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services05/06/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/20/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1835. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/06/2013)

United States Cadet Nurse Corps Equity Act - Deems service of a person as a member of the United States Cadet Nurse Corps between July 1, 1943, and December 15, 1945 (qualified service) to be active military service for purposes of all laws administered by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA).

Requires: (1) the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to issue an honorable discharge to each person whose qualified service warrants one, and (2) the discharge to be issued within one year after enactment of this Act.

Prohibits benefits from being paid to persons as a result of the enactment of this Act for any period before this Act's enactment date.