Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/06/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 05/06/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2014