Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/31/2014