Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/19/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/28/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/31/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/11/2014