Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/04/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/10/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/24/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/25/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/13/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/15/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/20/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/12/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 12/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/16/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/05/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/06/2014