There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

REPEAL HIV Discrimination Act of 2013
Repeal Existing Policies that Encourage and Allow Legal HIV Discrimination Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize laws, and eliminate discrimination, with respect to people living with HIV/AIDS, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/20/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/14/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/10/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/07/2013Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2013Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2013Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/20/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/11/2014

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/07/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations06/14/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/07/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/10/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services05/07/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/20/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1843. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/07/2013)

Repeal Existing Policies that Encourage and Allow Legal HIV Discrimination Act of 2013 or the REPEAL HIV Discrimination Act of 2013 - Expresses the sense of Congress that federal and state laws, policies, and regulations regarding people living with HIV/AIDS should: (1) not place unique or additional burdens on such individuals solely as a result of their HIV status; and (2) demonstrate a public health-oriented, evidence-based, medically accurate, and contemporary understanding of HIV transmission, health implications, treatment, and the impact of punitive HIV-specific laws, policies, regulations, and judicial precedents and decisions on public health and on affected people, families, and communities.

Directs: (1) the Attorney General (AG), Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), and Secretary of Defense (DOD) to initiate a national review of federal (including military) and state laws, policies, regulations, and judicial precedents and decisions regarding criminal and related civil commitment cases involving people living with HIV/AIDS; and (2) the AG to transmit to Congress and make publicly available the results of such review with related recommendations.

Requires the AG and HHS Secretary to: (1) develop and publicly release guidance and best practice recommendations for states, and (2) establish an integrated monitoring and evaluation system to measure state progress.

Directs the AG and HHS and DOD Secretaries to transmit to the President and Congress any proposals necessary to implement adjustments to federal laws, policies, or regulations.

Prohibits this Act from being construed to discourage the prosecution of individuals who intentionally transmit or attempt to transmit HIV to another individual.