Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/03/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/03/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/03/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/03/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/20/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/17/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/11/2014