Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/17/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 09/19/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/14/2014