Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/22/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/19/2014