Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
11/27/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-53.
11/27/2013 Signed by President.
11/21/2013 Presented to President.
11/14/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7080)
10/04/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2013 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 355).(text: CR H4492)
07/16/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-151.
05/07/2013 Introduced in House