There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Small Airplane Revitalization Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Small Airplane Revitalization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Airplane Revitalization Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Airplane Revitalization Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Small Airplane Revitalization Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that the Federal Aviation Administration advances the safety of small airplanes, and the continued development of the general aviation industry, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/27/2013Became Public Law No: 113-53. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2013Signed by President.
11/21/2013Presented to President.
11/14/2013Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7080)
10/04/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2013Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 355).(text: CR H4492)
07/16/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-151.
05/07/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber
11/27/2013Became Public Law No: 113-53. (TXT | PDF)
11/27/2013Signed by President.
11/21/2013HousePresented to President.
11/14/2013-3:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/14/2013-3:16pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7080)
11/14/2013-3:15pmHouseMr. Pompeo asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7080)
10/05/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/04/2013SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2013SenateS.Amdt.1999 Amendment SA 1999 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2013SenateS.Amdt.1999 Amendment SA 1999 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Klobuchar. (consideration: CR S7212-7213; text: CR S7212-7213) In the nature of a substitute.
10/04/2013SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7212-7213)
10/04/2013SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/17/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/16/2013-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/16/2013-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 355). (text: CR H4492)
07/16/2013-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4502-4503)
07/16/2013-5:19pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/16/2013-5:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1848.
07/16/2013-5:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4492-4494)
07/16/2013-5:03pmHouseMr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/16/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 109.
07/16/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-151.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/10/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/10/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/10/2013HouseSubcommittee on Aviation Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/13/2013HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3367)
05/08/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/07/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
05/07/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/07/2013 Referred to
07/10/2013 Markup by
07/16/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-151
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation05/08/2013 Referred to
07/10/2013 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/17/2013 Referred to
10/04/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1848. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-53 (11/27/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on October 4, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Small Airplane Revitalization Act of 2013 - Directs the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to issue a final rule to advance the safety and continued development of small airplanes by reorganizing the certification requirements to streamline the approval of safety advancements.

Requires the final rule to meet certain consensus-based standards and FAA Part 23 Reorganization Aviation Rulemaking Committee objectives, including: (1) establishment of a regulatory regime for small airplane safety; (2) the establishment of broad, outcome-driven objectives that will spur small plane innovation and technology adoption; (3) the replacement of current, prescriptive requirements under Part 23 with performance-based regulations; and (4) the use of FAA-accepted consensus standards to clarify how Part 23 safety objectives may be met using specific small plane safety designs and technologies.