Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/09/2013