Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/20/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-58.
12/20/2013 Signed by President.
12/19/2013 Presented to President.
12/17/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8917-8918)
10/22/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 551).(text: CR H6646)
09/27/2013 Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-232.
01/04/2013 Introduced in House