There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the United States courthouse located at 101 East Pecan Street in Sherman, Texas, as the "Paul Brown United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/20/2013Became Public Law No: 113-58. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2013Signed by President.
12/19/2013Presented to President.
12/17/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8917-8918)
10/22/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 551).(text: CR H6646)
09/27/2013Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-232.
01/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/20/2013Became Public Law No: 113-58. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2013Signed by President.
12/19/2013HousePresented to President.
12/18/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8917-8918)
10/28/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/22/2013-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 551). (text: CR H6646)
10/22/2013-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6658-6659)
10/22/2013-5:10pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/22/2013-5:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 185.
10/22/2013-5:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6646-6647)
10/22/2013-5:01pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/27/2013HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 57.
09/27/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-232.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/18/2013HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/07/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/04/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/04/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/04/2013 Referred to
07/18/2013 Markup by
09/27/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-232
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management01/07/2013 Referred to
07/18/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.185. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-58 (12/20/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. courthouse located at 101 East Pecan Street in Sherman, Texas, as the "Paul Brown United States Courthouse."