Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2014