Refine your search

Refined by:

Colorado Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/03/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/28/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/10/2014