Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 05/07/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/29/2014